RI H7348 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commencing 1/1/23, gradually increases the minimum wage for employees receiving gratuities from the current ($3.89) to ($14.95) by 1/1/2027 and on 1/1/2028 the minimum wage shall be no less than the minimum wage established by the minimum wage law.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2022) |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7348.pdf |