RI H7348 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a pilot program to promote the creation of roof solar installations on school property in order to reduce the use of fossil fuels and to generate electricity in school buildings.
Title
School Funds And Property
Sponsors
Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] |
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2018) |
2018-04-24 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/26/2018) |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7348.pdf |