RI H7345 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
WATERS AND NAVIGATION -- WATER RESOURCES MANAGEMENT - Allows the commissioners of the water and sewer commission for the town of Jamestown to limit its public water system's obligation to supply water only within designated and described area as opposed to the entire land area of the town.
Title
Allows the commissioners of the water and sewer commission for the town of Jamestown to limit its public water system's obligation to supply water only within designated and described area as opposed to the entire land area of the town.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2024) |
2024-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7345.pdf |