RI H7344 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the amount of malt beverages that a manufacturer can sell for offsite consumption from twenty-four 12 oz. And Twenty-four 16 oz. bottles or cans to Fifty-five 12 oz. and forty-one 16 oz. bottles and cans respectively.
Title
Manufacturing And Wholesale Licenses
Sponsors
Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/25/2020) |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Small Business |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7344.pdf |