RI H7343 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow consumers the right to decline the installation of a wireless smart meter and substitute a wired smart meter, and to completely decline the installation of any smart meter technology
Title
Relating To Public Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2014) |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7343.pdf |