RI H7343 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education - Health And Safety Of Pupils (would Allow Local School Districts The Option Of Utilizing Bus Monitors Or Alternative Technologies Which Provide Equivalent Safety For The Children And Must Be Approved By The Commissioner Of Elementary And Secondary Education)
Title
An Act Relating To Education - Health And Safety Of Pupils (would Allow Local School Districts The Option Of Utilizing Bus Monitors Or Alternative Technologies Which Provide Equivalent Safety For The Children And Must Be Approved By The Commissioner Of Elementary And Secondary Education)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-03 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2012) | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7343.pdf |