RI H7337 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of environmental management to solicit procurement of a representative organization to operate the paint stewardship program every two (2) years.
Title
Proper Management Of Unused Paint
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House read and passed |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/10/2020) |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-02-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (02/27/2020) |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2020) |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |