RI H7337 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the cost of maintaining an easement or right-of-way be the responsibility of the owner(s) of the property that the easement benefits.
Title
Maintenance Of Private Easements And Rights-of-way
Sponsors
Rep. Joy Hearn [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2018-05-15 | House | House read and passed |
2018-05-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/15/2018) |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/09/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2018) |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |