RI H7335 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LIBRARIES -- STATE AID TO LIBRARIES - Requires that the state's share to public libraries be fixed at twenty-five percent (25%) of the amount appropriated by the city or town in their budgets for fiscal year 2024, utilizing funds from the general fund or the American Rescue Plan Act.
Title
Requires that the state's share to public libraries be fixed at twenty-five percent (25%) of the amount appropriated by the city or town in their budgets for fiscal year 2024, utilizing funds from the general fund or the American Rescue Plan Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing (05/14/2024) |
2024-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7335.pdf |