RI H7332 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the provisions for prompt payment of monies owed by the department of administration to their contractors or subcontractors.
Title
Prompt Payment By Department Of Administration
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2020) |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7332.pdf |