RI H7324 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2018)
Pending: House Veterans Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 24 House Veterans Affairs Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the department of administration to add the names of Rhode Island residents who were killed in the terrorist attacks of September 11, 2001, to be added to the 9/11 Memorial located in the state house.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The 9/11 Memorial

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/24/2018)
2018-03-08HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018)
2018-01-26HouseIntroduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback