RI H7324 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the department of administration to add the names of Rhode Island residents who were killed in the terrorist attacks of September 11, 2001, to be added to the 9/11 Memorial located in the state house.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The 9/11 Memorial

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-07-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23HouseSenate passed as amended in concurrence
2018-06-23HouseSenate voted to reconsider
2018-06-22SenateSenate passed as amended in concurrence
2018-06-22SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-19SenateCommittee recommends passage as amended in concurrence
2018-06-15SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-05-31SenateReferred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
2018-05-30HouseHouse passed as amended (floor amendment)
2018-05-25HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/30/2018)
2018-05-24HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/24/2018)
2018-03-08HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018)
2018-01-26HouseIntroduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback