RI H7320 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires insurance carriers, nonprofit hospital service plans, nonprofit medical service corporations and health maintenance organizations to cover the costs of breast ultrasounds and or MRI breast exams.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-27HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2018)
2018-01-26HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback