RI H7311 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prevent anyone convicted of a misdemeanor domestic violence offense from purchasing, owning, carrying, transporting, or possessing a firearm
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Maria Cimini [D] | Rep. Linda Finn [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2014) |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7311.pdf |