RI H7308 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Renders void and unenforceable any motor transportation contract term indemnifying an indemnitee from or against its own negligence, intentional acts or omissions in contracts entered into or renewed on or after the effective date of the chapter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Carrier Transportation Contracts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28HouseSigned by Governor
2018-06-26HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-21SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-21SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-20HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-02-27HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2018)
2018-02-12HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (02/13/2018)
2018-02-09HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-01-25HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback