RI H7307 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits PFAS, a class of fluorinated organic chemicals, from being used in food packaging.
Title
Pfas In Food Packaging
Sponsors
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Alex Marszalkowski [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2020) |
2020-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7307.pdf |