RI H7304 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Howard Nesbitt to join Taylor Lynn Leahy and Frederick Robert Pierce in marriage on or about June 30, 2018, within the City of Warwick, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-20 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/12/2018) |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2018) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-03-01 | House | House read and passed |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/01/2018) |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2018) |
2018-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7304.pdf |