RI H7302 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the use of display fireworks, or aerial consumer fireworks without a permit between the hours of 12:00 a.m. and 7:00 a.m. on any day and makes a violation of this permit requirement a civil violation punishable by a fine of $75 and court costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Explosives, Fireworks, And Pyrotechnics

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 11 N: 61 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-03-01HouseHouse read and passed
2018-02-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/01/2018)
2018-02-13HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-02-09HouseScheduled for consideration (02/13/2018)
2018-02-06HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2018)
2018-01-25HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback