RI H7301 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits any person 18 years of age or older to possess a stun gun and permits those persons with a concealed carry permit can also carry a stun gun. Adds "tasers" to the definition of "firearm." Creates appeal process for denial of permit to carry.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Steven Lima [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. David Place [R] |
Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2022) |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7301.pdf |