RI H7300 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For A Plan And The Design Of A Beirut Memorial To Be Located At The Rhode Island State House (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For A Plan And The Design Of A Beirut Memorial To Be Located At The State House From April 30, 2018, To April 30, 2019, And Expires On May 30, 2019.)
Title
House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For A Plan And The Design Of A Beirut Memorial To Be Located At The Rhode Island State House (extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Commission To Study And Make Recommendations For A Plan And The Design Of A Beirut Memorial To Be Located At The State House From April 30, 2018, To April 30, 2019, And Expires On May 30, 2019.)
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Robert Lancia [R] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | House read and passed |
2018-03-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/08/2018) |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2018) |
2018-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |