RI H7299 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a person convicted of unnecessary cruelty on an animal from owning an animals for 5 years, and a violator of this act is subject to a fine of $1,000.
Title
Cruelty To Animals
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request |
2020-01-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/28/2020) |
2020-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7299.pdf |