RI H7299 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provided that any law or regulations which prohibits or protects a person from exposure to second-hand smoke would include second-hand marijuana smoke or vapor.
Title
Public Health And Workplace Safety Act
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] |
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2018) |
2018-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7299.pdf |