RI H7294 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits certain volunteer firefighters to purchase motor vehicles by utilizing state purchasing provisions.
Title
State Purchases
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] |
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2022) |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7294.pdf |