RI H7294 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a condominium association to impose a fee of up to one hundred twenty-five dollars ($125) for preparation of a resale certificate.
Title
Condominium Law - Resale Of Units
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Christopher Millea [D] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/05/2020) |
2020-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7294.pdf |