RI H7292 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for courses of study for pupils in grades kindergarten through 8 to prevent child abduction, child sexual exploitation, and abuse
Title
Curriculum
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. John Carnevale [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | House read and passed |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-04-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/16/2014) |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |