RI H7291 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits redevelopment agencies to finance the construction of projects for residential, recreational, commercial, industrial, institutional, public, or other purposes contemplated by a redevelopment plan.
Title
Redevelopment Agencies And Projects
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. David Coughlin [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-05-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2018) |
2018-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7291.pdf |