RI H7290 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Senate passed Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

- Redevelopment Agencies And Projects

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

- Redevelopment Agencies And Projects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-22SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-22SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-22SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-06-22SenateReferred to Senate Finance
2018-06-22HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-21HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-21HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-21HouseSubstitute A
2018-06-20HouseScheduled for consideration (06/21/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-06-15HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-05-31HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-29HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2018)
2018-01-25HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback