RI H7288 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $100,000 To The Department Of Environmental Management (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $100,000 To The Department Of Environmental Management To Fund And Assist The City Of Central Falls In Implementing Aerial Spraying To Inhibit The Growth Of Water Chestnuts Along The Blackstone River.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $100,000 To The Department Of Environmental Management (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $100,000 To The Department Of Environmental Management To Fund And Assist The City Of Central Falls In Implementing Aerial Spraying To Inhibit The Growth Of Water Chestnuts Along The Blackstone River.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7288.pdf |