RI H7288 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the division of motor vehicles to collect outstanding excise taxes at the time of registration of a motor vehicle, and remit such amounts to the applicable city, town or fire district.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
Rep. Justin Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2018) |
2018-04-24 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/25/2018) |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7288.pdf |