RI H7276 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - Meeting postponed (06/14/2016)
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - Meeting postponed (06/14/2016)
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes the maintenance, servicing, and testing of certain electrical components within the purview of chapter and corrects and clarifies certain outdated language and increases the penalties for violations of this chapter.
Title
Electricians
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. John Desimone [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | House | Meeting postponed (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2016-02-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/09/2016) |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7276.pdf |