RI H7274 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/26/2018)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts the town of Little Compton from the law allowing municipalities to waive interest on one quarter of overdue property tax payments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25HouseWithdrawn at sponsor's request (04/26/2018)
2018-04-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-04-12HouseCommittee transferred to House Municipal Government
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback