RI H7273 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that special education services would include speech-language pathology services, and would not stop because a child has reached nine (9) years of age.
Title
Children With Disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Committee on Education: Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Committee on Education: Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/14/2022) |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2022) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2022-04-05 | House | House read and passed |
2022-04-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/05/2022) |
2022-03-30 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-03-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/30/2022) |
2022-02-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/16/2022) |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |