RI H7271 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Gareau Enterprises, Inc.
Title
To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Of Gareau Enterprises, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Committee on Corporations: Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-03-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/15/2022) |
2022-03-01 | House | House read and passed |
2022-02-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/01/2022) |
2022-02-16 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/16/2022) |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |