RI H7271 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes council to grant variances to any provisions of title 16 other than those in ยง 16-60-4.2 and to any department of education and school district regulation not affecting the health/safety/civil rights of public school pupils.
Title
Council On Elementary And Secondary Education
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2018) |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7271.pdf |