RI H7270 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission Relating To Education - School Committees And Superintendents (this Resolution Would Extend The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission Relating To Education – School Committees And Superintendents From January 31, 2018, To June 30, 2018, And Said Commission Would Expire On July 30, 2018.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission Relating To Education - School Committees And Superintendents (this Resolution Would Extend The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission Relating To Education – School Committees And Superintendents From January 31, 2018, To June 30, 2018, And Said Commission Would Expire On July 30, 2018.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28HouseHouse read and passed
2018-02-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (02/28/2018)
2018-02-14HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-02-09HouseScheduled for consideration (02/14/2018)
2018-02-07HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2018)
2018-01-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback