RI H7268 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations For Uniform Multi-state Nursing License Requirements (amends The Interstate Nurse Licensure Compact And Adopts An Enhanced And More Comprehensive Version Of The Compact, To Allow Nurses To Hold A Multi-state License Allowing Them To Practice Across State Lines Without Having To Obtain Multiple Licenses.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study And Provide Recommendations For Uniform Multi-state Nursing License Requirements (amends The Interstate Nurse Licensure Compact And Adopts An Enhanced And More Comprehensive Version Of The Compact, To Allow Nurses To Hold A Multi-state License Allowing Them To Practice Across State Lines Without Having To Obtain Multiple Licenses.)
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-19 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2022) |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |