RI H7254 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes an economic growth blockchain act, set regulations for the sale of hemp, regulate virtual and digital assets, and establish depository banks for these purposes.
Title
Rhode Island Economic Growth Blockchain Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Barbara Ann Fenton-Fung [R] |
Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Justin Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2022) |
2022-01-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7254.pdf |