RI H7251 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Permits the use of fax or email transmission of the medical certificate required for issuance of a CDL by the division of motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Driver's License

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04HouseSigned by Governor
2018-05-29HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-29SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/29/2018)
2018-05-23SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2018-05-18SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
2018-04-10HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-04-06HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/10/2018)
2018-04-04HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for reconsideration (04/04/2018)
2018-03-28HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-03-23HouseScheduled for consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-02-13HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-09HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/13/2018)
2018-01-19HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback