RI H7249 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- COUNCIL ON POSTSECONDARY EDUCATION - Restores longevity payments of five percent (5%) of base salary for employees after ten (10) years of service and increase to ten percent (10%) of base salary after twenty (20) years of service, beginning July 1, 2024.
Title
Restores longevity payments of five percent (5%) of base salary for employees after ten (10) years of service and increase to ten percent (10%) of base salary after twenty (20) years of service, beginning July 1, 2024.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2024) |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7249.pdf |