RI H7248 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits possession/breeding of wildcats/hybrid cats without a permit from DEM. Exempts facilities accredited by AZA. Violators subject to $500 fine or 90 days imprisonment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wildcats And Hybrid Cats

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2018)
2018-01-25HouseCommittee transferred to House H.E.W.
2018-01-19HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback