RI H7247 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that the state's share of foundation education aid would follow the student, the school the student is attending, and that districts would make adjustments between themselves for and to the nearest monthly increment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education Equity And Property Tax Relief Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-05-11HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2018)
2018-04-26HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018)
2018-01-19HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback