RI H7236 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides guidelines for the delegation by licensed health care professionals of non-ablative laser or energy-based treatments to a properly-qualified delegate.
Title
Delegation Of Non-ablative Treatments
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] |
Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/31/2018) |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7236.pdf |