RI H7234 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for additional appropriations by the general assembly to promote the capability of URI in the areas of environmental and agricultural research and education.
Title
University Of Rhode Island
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/28/2016) |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7234.pdf |