RI H7234 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Define various farm enterprise uses that are recognized as a valuable and viable means of contributing to the preservation of agricultural operations
Title
Relating To Agriculture And Forestry
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Donna Walsh [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] |
Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] |
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-18 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-17 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-06-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-05-22 | House | Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-04-30 | House | House read and passed |
2014-04-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/30/2014) |
2014-04-17 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-04-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/17/2014) |
2014-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2014) |
2014-02-13 | House | Meeting postponed (02/13/2014) |
2014-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |