RI H7232 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals the restrictions on the use of the waters off Goat Island which are no longer needed since the closing of the torpedo station there.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Obstructions To Navigation - Waters Off Goat Island

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-01-26HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2018)
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback