RI H7231 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Committee transferred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates an accident compensation fund to provide payments and benefits to those injured by uninsured motorists, to be administered by the automobile accident compensation corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rhode Island Automobile Accident Compensation Corporation Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseCommittee transferred to House Finance
2018-02-13HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (02/13/2018)
2018-02-09HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback