RI H7230 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the division of motor vehicles to issue a courtesy registration plate for a vehicle more than twenty-five (25) years old.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration Of Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Registration of vehicles approval of amendment (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateSigned by Governor
2018-06-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-21HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/21/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-02-13HouseCommittee transferred to House Finance
2018-02-13HouseCommittee postponed at request of sponsor (02/13/2018)
2018-02-09HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback