RI H7227 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands jurisdiction of the family court in regard to certain immigrant children.
Title
Courts - Family Court
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2018) |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7227.pdf |