RI H7220 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the joint committee of the repealer in the general assembly.
Title
Joint Committee Of The Repealer
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. David Coughlin [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] |
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2018) |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7220.pdf |