RI H7215 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "disabled," persons receiving veterans' affairs disability benefits paid by the federal government for purposes of property tax relief and be retroactive to January 1, 2017.
Title
Relating To Taxation
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] |
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2018) |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7215.pdf |